IL HB5539 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Administrative Act. Requires the Department of Human Services, by June 30, 2022, to select from the Prioritization of the Urgency of Need of Services (PUNS) database no fewer than 3,600 persons with intellectual or developmental disabilities to receive relevant State services and supports. Provides that no fewer than 600 persons shall be selected to receive services by June 30, 2019 and the numbers of persons selected shall increase each year thereafter until the list of persons in the PUNS is exhausted. Requires the Department to pursue all federal funding options for intellectual and developmental services and supports including applying for a demonstration waiver and a State Plan amendment to expand and increase the availability of services to persons with intellectual and developmental disabilities. Requires federal funding obtained under a demonstration waiver to be directed towards increasing the availability of permanent supportive housing and other community-integrated living arrangements. Requires federal funding obtained as a result of federal approval of a Medicaid State Plan amendment to fund a Illinois Children and Adult Home and Community-Based Services Pilot Program to expand and increase community-based services and housing options for adults and children eligible for services under the Department's Home and Community-Based Services Waiver programs. Provides that subject to federal approval, the availability of housing options and support services provided under a demonstration waiver or Medicaid State Plan amendment shall be fully implemented by June 30, 2022. Contains provisions on reporting requirements and other matters.
Title
DHS-HOUSING/SUPPORT SERVICES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-06-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2018-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2018-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5539&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5539.htm |