IL HB5552 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Illinois Container Fee and Deposit Act. Provides for a deposit value of 5 cents to be paid by consumers on each beverage container sold in the State by a dealer for consumption. Provides that upon the return to a dealer or person operating a redemption center, the dealer or redemption center shall pay the value of the deposit back to the consumer as a refund. Sets forth requirements for the administration of the program. Provides certain exemptions to the program. Requires that the refund value be clearly indicated on all beverage containers sold in the State. Provides for the Environmental Protection Agency to certify redemption centers. Prohibits snap-top beverage containers. Provides that persons violating the Act shall be guilty of a Class C misdemeanor. Prohibits the manufacture of certain plastic metal beverage containers. Prohibits the disposal of beverage containers at sanitary landfills. Provides that deposits not passed on to the consumer through bottle redemption shall be distributed as follows: 75% to the Agency for environmental and conservation-related programs, and 25% to each distributor in proportion to the amount of beverage containers each distributor sold in the State. Amends the State Finance Act to create the Illinois Container Fee and Deposit Fund. Amends the Illinois Food, Drug and Cosmetic Act. Provides that a full service restaurant or quick service restaurant shall not provide single use plastic disposable foodware items to a consumer ordering or purchasing dine-in food unless requested by the consumer. Contains other specified requirements for full service or quick service restaurants and provides civil penalties for any violations. Effective July 1, 2021.
Title
RECYCLING-BEVERAGE CONTAINER
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-03 | House | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2020-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2020-02-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.930 | New Code | See Bill Text |
410 | 620 | 16.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5552&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5552.htm |