IL HB5618 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-11)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Use Tax Act, the Service Use Tax Act, the Service Occupation Tax Act, and the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Provides that, beginning on July 1, 2020, breast pumps, breast pump collection and storage supplies, and breast pump kits are exempt from the taxes imposed under those Acts. Effective immediately.
Title
USE/OCC TX-BREAST PUMPS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2020-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2020-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nathan D. Reitz |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2020-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2020-02-20 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2020-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2020-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2020-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2020-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2020-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2020-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2020-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2020-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 105 | 3-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 110 | 3-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 115 | 3-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 2-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5618&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5618.htm |