IL HB5629 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-15 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-15 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Certified Professional Midwives Practice Act. Provides for the licensure of midwives by the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation and for certain limitations on the activities of licensed midwives. Creates the Illinois Midwifery Board. Sets forth provisions concerning application, qualifications, grounds for disciplinary action, and administrative procedures. Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act to set a repeal date for the new Act of January 1, 2031. Amends the Illinois Insurance Code, the Medical Practice Act of 1987, the Nurse Practice Act, and the Illinois Public Aid Code to make related changes.
Title
MIDWIVES PRACTICE ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2020-03-03 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2020-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2020-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2020-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2020-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2020-02-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2020-02-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2020-02-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2020-02-20 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2020-02-20 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2020-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 356z.43 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 60 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 65 | 5-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 65 | 50-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 5-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 80 | 4.41 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5629&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5629.htm |