IL HB5635 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-10 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-10 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that, in addition to other elements defining the offense, a person commits criminal sexual assault if that person commits an act of sexual penetration and is a physician licensed under the Medical Practice Act of 1987 to practice medicine in all of its branches or licensed as a chiropractic physician under that Act and the victim is a patient under the physician or chiropractic physicians's care or to whom the physician or chiropractic physician has access due to his or her practice as a physician or chiropractic physician. Effective January 1, 2021.
Title
CRIM CD-CRIM SEXUAL ASSAULT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-06-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joyce Mason |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 11-1.20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 12-13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5635&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5635.htm |