IL HB5673 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-03 - Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-03 - Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Power Agency Act. For electric utilities that serve less than 3,000,000 retail customers but more than 500,000 retail customers in this State: defines "energy efficiency"; in provisions concerning the renewable portfolio standards, specifies the goals for procurement of renewable energy credits and cost-effective renewable energy resources that shall be included in the long-term renewable resources procurement plan and makes other changes concerning these procurements; and provides for the calculation of the cost of equity for the purposes of recovering all reasonable and prudently incurred costs of energy efficiency measures from retail customers. Provides that savings of fuels other than electricity achieved by measures that educate about, incentivize, encourage or otherwise support the use of electricity to power vehicles shall count towards the applicable annual incremental goal and shall not be included in determining certain limits. Amends the Public Utilities Act. Provides that an electric utility that serves less than 3,000,000 retail customers but more than 500,000 customers in this State may plan for, construct, install, control, own, manage, or operate photovoltaic electricity production facilities and any energy storage facilities that are planned for, constructed, installed, controlled, owned, managed or operated in connection with photovoltaic electricity production facilities without obtaining a certificate of public convenience and necessity subject to specified terms and conditions. Defines "electric vehicle", "electric vehicle charging station", and "energy storage" for the purposes of the Electric Service Customer Choice and Rate Relief Law of 1997. Provides that, beginning in 2022, without obtaining any approvals from the Illinois Commerce Commission or any other agency, regardless of whether any such approval would otherwise be required, a participating utility that is a combination utility shall pay $1,000,000 per year for 10 years to the energy low-income and support program. Adds provisions authorizing certain utilities to plan for, construct, install, control, own, manage or operate electric vehicle charging infrastructure, including, but not limited to, electric vehicle charging stations within their service territories. Effective immediately.
Title
RENEWABLE ENERGY-VEHICLES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-03 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2020-09-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2020-07-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2020-03-17 | House | Assigned to Public Utilities Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2020-03-04 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2020-02-25 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2020-02-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-25 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2020-02-21 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2020-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2020-02-21 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3855 | 1-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3855 | 1-75 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 16-102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 16-107.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 16-108.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
220 | 5 | 16-108.20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
220 | 5 | 16-108.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 16-128A | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 8-103B | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 8-218 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5673&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5673.htm |