IL HB5757 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-18 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-18 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates various amounts to the Commission on Government Forecasting and Accountability, the Legislative Audit Commission, the Joint Committee on Administrative Rules, the Legislative Information System, the Legislative Printing Unit, the Legislative Reference Bureau, and the Architect of the Capitol for operations expenses for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2021. Effective July 1, 2020.
Title
$LEGIS SUPPORT SERVICES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-05-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-03-11 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2020-03-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5757&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/PDF/10100HB5757.pdf |