IL HB5794 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-22 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-22 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Controlled Substances Act. Provides that the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation (instead of the Department of Human Services) must provide for a Prescription Monitoring Program for Schedule II, III, IV, and V controlled substances. Makes conforming and related changes. Provides that within one year after the effective date of the amendatory Act (instead of within one year of January 1, 2018) the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation (instead of the Department of Human Services) shall adopt rules requiring all Electronic Health Records Systems to interface with the Prescription Monitoring Program application program on or before January 1, 2022 (instead of January 1, 2021) to ensure that all providers have access to specific patient records during the treatment of their patients. Contains provisions concerning the transfer of rulemaking authority to the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation from the Department of Human Services. Effective immediately.
Title
DFPR-PRESCRIPTION MONITORING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-05-22 | House | First Reading |
2020-05-22 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 570 | 102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 570 | 203 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 570 | 205 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 570 | 207 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 570 | 209 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 570 | 211 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 570 | 316 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 570 | 317 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 570 | 318 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 570 | 320 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 570 | 507.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5794&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5794.htm |