IL HB5826 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on August 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-10 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-10 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Police Department Nonlethal Force Policy Act. Provides that the Illinois State Police, Secretary of State Police Department, and each mass transit district police force, university police force, county sheriff's office, and municipal police department of this State shall develop a plan or strategy for the use of nonlethal force on a person suspected of committing or having committed a criminal offense or resisting arrest. The plan or strategy shall include the use of new technologies and alternatives to the use of firearms in apprehending a suspect or in protecting the officer from harm by a suspect.
Title
POLICE-NONLETHAL FORCE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-11-10 | House | First Reading |
2020-09-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2020-09-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2020-09-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2020-09-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2020-09-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2020-09-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2020-09-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2020-09-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2020-09-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2020-09-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2020-09-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2020-09-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2020-09-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2020-09-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2020-09-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2020-09-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2020-09-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2020-08-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2020-08-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5826&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5826.htm |