IL HB5939 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a person commits the offense of unlawful use of weapons when he knowingly sells, manufactures, purchases, possesses, or carries a firearm with: (1) a major component of which, if subjected to inspection by common metal detection devices, would not be detectable; or (2) a major component of which, if subjected to inspection by common imaging detection devices, would not generate an image that accurately depicts the shape of the component. Provides that this offense is a Class 2 felony. Creates exemptions. Effective immediately.
Title
CRIM CD-UUW-FIREARM DETECTION
Sponsors
Rep. Michelle Mussman [D] | Rep. Martin Moylan [D] | Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D] | Rep. Deborah Conroy [D] |
Sen. John Connor [D] | Rep. Dave Severin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-11-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-11-07 | House | First Reading |
2018-08-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2018-08-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2018-08-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-08-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-08-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2018-08-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 24-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5939&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5939.htm |