IL HB5957 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Commission on Fiscal Responsibility and Reform Act. Provides that the Commission on Fiscal Responsibility and Reform shall consist of 18 voting members. Provides for the appointment of the members. Provides that the Commission shall undertake a review of executive branch State agencies and provide recommendations for improvement. Provides that the Commission shall submit a report to the Governor and the General Assembly. Creates the Commission on Fiscal Responsibility and Reform Fund, which may receive gifts, grants, and donations from any lawful source. Provides that moneys in the Fund shall be used by the Commission exclusively for public purposes. Provides that the Commission on Fiscal Responsibility and Reform shall operate as a 501(c)(4) entity under the federal Internal Revenue Code. Repeals the Act on October 1, 2020. Amends the State Finance Act to create the Commission on Fiscal Responsibility and Reform Fund. Effective immediately.
Title
COMM ON FISCAL RESPONSIBILITY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-11-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2018-11-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-11-07 | House | First Reading |
2018-10-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2018-10-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2018-10-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-10-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2018-10-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2018-10-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2018-09-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2018-09-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2018-09-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2018-09-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Steven Reick |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5957&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5957.htm |