IL HJR0001 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-12 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-12 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the operation of the Cybersecurity Task Force originally created by House Joint Resolution 59 of the 100th General Assembly.
Title
CYBERSECURITY TSK FORCE-EXTEND
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-12 - House - Motion in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-04-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-04-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2019-04-12 | House | Resolution Adopted as Amended 108-000-000 |
2019-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2019-03-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2019-03-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. André Thapedi |
2019-02-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-02-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2019-02-28 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee; 012-000-000 |
2019-02-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. André Thapedi |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee |
2019-01-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-11-30 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. André Thapedi |