IL HJR0011 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-02 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-02 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Levee and Floodplain Review Task Force to conduct a comprehensive review of State and federal laws and regulations establishing the oversight and management of river levels and regulation of levee construction and develop recommendations to create and implement a plan for the long-term management of the State's floodplains that balances the needs of agriculture, industry, public safety, the environment, and the overall economy of Illinois regarding levees and floodplains.
Title
LEVEE & FLOODPLAIN TASK FORCE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2019-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |