IL HJR0018 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the Trade Policy Task Force within the Illinois Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity - Office of Trade and Investment to (1) analyze important issues relative to the growth of international trade from and to Illinois; (2) make recommendations to Congress, the United States Trade Representative, and the White House National Trade Council regarding trade policies that best serve Illinois; and (3) promote the exportation of goods and services from Illinois and the Importation of goods and services into Illinois.
Title
EXTEND-TRADE POLICY TASK FORCE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-31 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - Motion in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - Motion in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 059-000-000 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Be Adopted Commerce and Economic Development; 010-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Commerce and Economic Development |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2019-02-27 | House | Resolution Adopted 112-000-000 |
2019-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-02-20 | House | Recommends Be Adopted International Trade & Commerce Committee; 008-000-000 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to International Trade & Commerce Committee |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. André Thapedi |