IL HJR0024 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-1)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-1)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Supports, as a civil right, automatic citizenship to all qualifying children adopted by a U.S. citizen parent, regardless of the date on which the adoption was finalized. Condemns the deportation of individuals who were adopted into American homes and should have every expectation that their citizenship matches that of their adoptive parents. Welcomes legislation that will provide citizenship for all adult adoptees whose adoptive parents did not complete the naturalization process while they were children.
Title
CITIZENSHIP-U.S. ADOPTEES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-03-19 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-13 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-02-19 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 013-000-000 |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2019-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2019-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2019-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=24&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HJR/10100HJ0024.htm |