IL HJR0037 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Rural Development Task Force to study the conditions, needs, issues, and problems in the agriculture industry and evaluate any action or legislation that may be necessary to promote economic development in the rural areas of the State.
Title
RURAL DEVELOPMENT TASK FORCE
Sponsors
Rep. Patrick Windhorst [R] | Rep. Dave Severin [R] | Rep. Michael Marron [R] | Sen. Dale Fowler [R] |
Sen. Jason Plummer [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-31 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - Motion in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - Motion in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 057-000-000 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Be Adopted Commerce and Economic Development; 010-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Commerce and Economic Development |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-02 | House | Resolution Adopted 104-000-000 |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-03-19 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 013-000-000 |
2019-03-12 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patrick Windhorst |