IL HJR0046 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-4)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-4)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates First Avenue in Melrose Park as it travels from its intersection with North Avenue to its intersection with River Road as the "Kiddieland Amusement Park Road".
Title
KIDDIELAND AMUSEMENT PARK ROAD
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-31 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - Motion in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - Motion in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 057-000-000 |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-05-15 | House | Resolution Adopted 115-000-000 |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-04-30 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 012-000-000 |
2019-03-26 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |