IL HJR0062 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-31 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-31 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the Utica River Bridge as the "Ralph E. Snell Memorial Bridge."
Title
RALPH E. SNELL MEMORIAL BRIDGE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - House - Motion in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-05-15 | House | Resolution Adopted 117-000-000 |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-04-30 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 012-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lance Yednock |