IL HJR0066 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the interchange at Interstate 90 and Illinois Route 23 as the "Deputy Jacob Keltner Memorial Interchange".
Title
DEPUTY J. KELTNER INTERCHANGE
Sponsors
Rep. Steven Reick [R] | Rep. John Cabello [R] | Rep. Tom Weber [R] | Rep. Dan Ugaste [R] |
Rep. Allen Skillicorn [R] | Sen. Craig Wilcox [R] | Sen. Donald DeWitte [R] | Sen. Dan McConchie [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 059-000-000 |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-05-27 | House | Resolution Adopted 117-000-000 |
2019-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor All Other Members of the House |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-05-16 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 009-000-000 |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-05-07 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2019-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2019-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2019-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2019-04-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Steven Reick |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=66&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HJR/10100HJ0066.htm |