IL HJR0068 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Task Force on the Funding of Commission-authorized Charter Schools to examine funding and related issues.
Title
CHARTER SCHOOLS TASK FORCE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | House | Tabled |
2020-02-18 | House | Motion Prevailed by Voice Vote |
2019-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-06-01 | House | Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-05-15 | House | Recommends Be Adopted as Amended Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; 005-002-000 |
2019-05-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; by Voice Vote |
2019-05-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-05-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-05-07 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |