IL HJR0073 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-20 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-20 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the portion of Old Highway 136 from E. 950th St. to E. 750th St. between Macomb and Colchester as the "Lt. Col. John Stein Memorial Highway."
Title
LT. COL. JOHN STEIN MEM HWY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-05-17 | House | Resolution Adopted 107-000-000 |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-05-16 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 009-000-000 |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-05-14 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2019-05-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=73&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HJR/10100HJ0073.htm |