IL HJR0074 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares May of 2019 as "Asian American and Pacific Islander Heritage Month" and welcomes everyone to "Asian American Action Day" on May 15, 2019 at the Capitol.
Title
ASIAN AMERICAN HERITAGE MONTH
Sponsors
Rep. Theresa Mah [D] | Rep. Grant Wehrli [R] | Rep. Fred Crespo [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez [D] |
Sen. Ram Villivalam [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-05-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2019-05-27 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2019-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-05-24 | House | Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 010-000-000 |
2019-05-23 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-05-23 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 State Government Administration Committee; Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-05-23 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2019-05-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=74&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HJR/10100HJ0074.htm |