IL HJR0078 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Designates the Plainfield Road Bridge over Interstate 294 as the "Kelli Joy O'Laughlin Memorial Bridge".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

K. O'LAUGHLIN MEMORIAL BRIDGE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-30HouseAdopted Both Houses
2019-05-30SenateResolution Adopted; 059-000-000
2019-05-30SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak
2019-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions
2019-05-30SenateBe Adopted State Government; 007-000-000
2019-05-30SenateWaive Posting Notice
2019-05-30SenateAssigned to State Government
2019-05-28SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-05-28SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2019-05-28SenateArrive in Senate
2019-05-27HouseResolution Adopted 117-000-000
2019-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2019-05-24HouseRecommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 010-000-000
2019-05-23HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2019-05-23HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris
2019-05-23HouseAssigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
2019-05-17HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-05-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback