IL HJR0088 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the portion of Illinois Route 111 along Godfrey Road from Ramona Place to Crestwood Drive as the "Eldon 'Twirp' Williams Memorial Highway".
Title
E. WILLIAMS MEMORIAL HIGHWAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-03 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2019-10-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-10-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Monica Bristow |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=88&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HJR/10100HJ0088.htm |