IL HJR0108 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the Illinois State Board of Education, by the 2020-2021 school year, to establish a P-12 Cyber Threat Response Team within the State Board of Education to provide assistance to public schools, early childhood providers, and special education facilities across the State when faced with a cybersecurity threat.
Title
ED. CYBER THREAT RESPONSE TEAM
Sponsors
Rep. Grant Wehrli [R] | Rep. Avery Bourne [R] | Rep. Amy Grant [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2020-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2020-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Grant Wehrli |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=108&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HJR/10100HJ0108.htm |