IL HJR0118 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 43-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Governor JB Pritzker to instruct the Illinois Department of Corrections to comply with federal law and allow the DOC to continue to work with ICE and local law enforcement agencies.
Title
ALLOW IDOC TO WORK WITH ICE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-17 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Stephens |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2020-02-28 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2020-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2020-02-27 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2020-02-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=118&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HJR/10100HJ0118.htm |