IL HJRCA0040 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes to amend the Revenue Article of the Illinois Constitution. Provides that no moneys, including bond proceeds, derived from taxes, fees, excises, or licenses relating to registration, licensing, carrying, or possession of firearms or firearm ammunition or related to the use of firearms or firearm ammunition shall be expended for purposes other than the following: the costs of administering and enforcing laws related to firearms and firearm ammunition; and, with respect to local governments, other firearm and firearm ammunition regulation purposes as authorized by law. Provides that the costs of administering laws related to firearms and firearm ammunition shall be limited to direct program expenses related to the following: the enforcement of firearm and firearm ammunition regulation laws; the safety of persons from unlawful use of firearms or firearm ammunition; or the regulation of the carrying of firearms. Provides that the limitations to the costs of administering laws related to firearms and firearm ammunition shall also include direct program expenses related to workers' compensation claims for death or injury of employees enforcing firearm and firearm ammunition laws and investigations for improving the safety of the employees enforcing those laws. Provides that none of the revenues described in these provisions shall, by transfer, offset, or otherwise, be diverted to any purpose other than those described in these provisions. Provides that investment income that is attributable to the investment of moneys in funds used for the regulation of firearms and firearm ammunition shall be retained in those funds for the uses specified in these provisions. Effective upon being declared adopted.
Title
CON AMEND-FIREARM REG FUNDS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2020-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2020-02-18 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Read in Full a First Time |
2020-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2020-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2020-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2020-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2020-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2020-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2020-02-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2020-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ryan Spain |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=40&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HJRCA&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HJRCA/10100HC0040.htm |