IL HR0031 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
States the belief that the Illinois Constitution should not be amended to permit a graduated income tax.
Title
OPPOSES GRADUATED INCOME TAX
Sponsors
Rep. David McSweeney [R] | Rep. Jerry Costello [D] | Rep. Mark Batinick [R] | Rep. Margo McDermed [R] |
Rep. Brad Halbrook [R] | Rep. David Welter [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-28 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2019-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2019-02-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2019-02-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2019-02-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-02-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=31&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0031.htm |