IL HR0034 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizes the 40th anniversary of the United States Congress's enacting of the Taiwan Relations Act and reiterates support for a closer economic and trade partnership between the United States and Taiwan.
Title
US-TAIWAN RELATIONS-SUPPORT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2019-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-02-20 | House | Recommends Be Adopted International Trade & Commerce Committee; 008-000-000 |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to International Trade & Commerce Committee |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=34&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0034.htm |