IL HR0056 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expresses support for certain projects in the south suburbs.
Title
SOUTH SUBURB PROJECTS-SUPPORT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-02-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-02-27 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Economic Opportunity & Equity Committee; 015-000-000 |
2019-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2019-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to Economic Opportunity & Equity Committee |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=56&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0056.htm |