IL HR0058 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the Illinois Department of Public Health to adopt new guidelines for painkillers.
Title
DPH-PAINKILLER GUIDELINES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-03-20 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Prescription Drug Affordability & Accessibility Committee; 012-000-000 |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to Prescription Drug Affordability & Accessibility Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2019-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2019-02-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-02-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2019-01-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-01-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2019-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-01-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-01-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=58&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0058.htm |