IL HR0077 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 18-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Opposes any state taxes based on the number of miles driven.
Title
PER MILE DRIVING TAX-OPPOSE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2019-02-28 | House | To Sales, Amusement & Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=77&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0077.htm |