IL HR0092 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-02 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-02 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Task Force on Life and Health Sciences to study the future of medicine, health, and wellness which depends on manufacturing, education, and innovation in the life and health sciences.
Title
TASK FORCE LIFE-HEALTH SCIENCE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2019-05-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2019-03-12 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |