IL HR0109 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-13)
Status: Passed on October 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-30 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-13)
Status: Passed on October 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-30 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares November 2019 as Food Pantry Donation Month to raise a greater awareness of food insecurity and the impact food insecurity has on the residents of Illinois.
Title
FOOD PANTRY DONATION MONTH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2019-10-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2019-10-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-10-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2019-10-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2019-10-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-10-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-10-29 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2019-10-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2019-10-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2019-10-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2019-10-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2019-10-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-10-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-10-28 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 009-000-000 |
2019-10-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nathan D. Reitz |
2019-10-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2019-10-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2019-10-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-10-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2019-10-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
2019-10-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-10-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2019-10-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-10-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-10-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2019-10-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2019-10-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-10-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-10-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-10-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-10-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2019-10-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-10-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2019-10-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2019-10-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-10-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2019-10-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2019-10-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2019-10-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2019-10-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-10-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-10-21 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2019-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=109&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0109.htm |