IL HR0185 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges that any new capital spending plan include a significant new initiative to fund the acquisition, restoration, and management of natural areas and open spaces.
Title
CAPITAL PLAN-NATURAL AREAS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2019-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-05-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-04-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2019-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2019-03-26 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Capital Committee |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=185&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0185.htm |