IL HR0209 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Education Secretary Betsy DeVos and the Department of Education to withdraw the proposed rule and instead pursue policies that reflect the concerns raised by law enforcement, create a safe environment for victims to report instances, aggressively address the problem of campus sexual assault and harassment, and broadly address all instances of sexual harassment affecting college students.
Title
NEW SEXUAL HARASSMENT RULES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2019-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2019-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2019-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-03-26 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2019-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2019-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=209&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0209.htm |