IL HR0216 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Resolution Adopted as Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Resolution Adopted as Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Declares November 2019 as Schaaf-Yang Syndrome Awareness Month to raise awareness, promote inclusion, encourage research, and share hope.
Title
SCHAAF-YANG AWARENESS MONTH
Sponsors
Rep. Luis Arroyo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | House | Resolution Adopted as Amended |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-05-01 | House | Recommends Be Adopted as Amended Human Services Committee; 011-000-000 |
2019-05-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-04-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2019-04-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Luis Arroyo |