IL HR0236 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-21 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-21 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Condemns the extreme rhetoric of Illinois Family Action, calls for a formal investigation into the group's hate speech and threats, and asks that the Secretary of State's office suspend the lobbying credentials of any individual working on behalf of Illinois Family Action or its parent organization, the Illinois Family Institute, until an investigation is complete. Calls for a review of security procedures in the Capitol Complex, including, but not limited to, the Secretary of State and the Illinois State Police. Expresses solidarity against hateful, racist, anti-Semitic, and homophobic rhetoric of all kinds and calls for decent, respectful debate.
Title
ILL. FAMILY ACTION-HATE SPEECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2019-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-03-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=236&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0236.htm |