IL HR0274 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizes May 2, 2019 as the National Day of Prayer.
Title
RECOGNIZE-NAT. DAY OF PRAYER
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2019-05-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-05-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2019-05-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2019-05-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-05-01 | House | Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 010-000-000 |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2019-04-24 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey |
2019-04-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dan Caulkins |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=274&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0274.htm |