IL HR0327 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares May 4, 2019 as Auctioneers Day in the State of Illinois.
Title
AUCTIONEERS DAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-05-16 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 023-000-000 |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Labor & Commerce Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-05-07 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael Halpin |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=327&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0327.htm |