IL HR0337 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Declares May 8, 2019 as Alpha Phi Alpha day in the State of Illinois.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ALPHA PHI ALPHA DAY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-30HouseResolution Adopted
2019-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2019-05-15HouseRecommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 015-000-000
2019-05-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2019-05-14HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2019-05-14HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Higher Education Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris
2019-05-07HouseAssigned to Higher Education Committee
2019-05-01HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-30HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback