IL HR0356 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Directs the Department of Agriculture to conduct a disparity study on whether minority and women-owned businesses face any barriers that prevent the equitable participation in the business of cultivating, manufacturing, delivering, distributing, testing, transporting, and other avenues within the business of legalized cannabis in Illinois.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LEGALIZED CANNABIS-AG STUDY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-02HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-07-02HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-05-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. André Thapedi
2019-05-14HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2019-05-14HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris
2019-05-14HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-05-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-05-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2019-05-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2019-05-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2019-05-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2019-05-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2019-05-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2019-05-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
2019-05-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2019-05-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2019-05-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr.
2019-05-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner
2019-05-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-05-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-05-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2019-05-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-05-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
2019-05-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-05-07HouseChief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2019-05-07HouseChief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-05-07HouseChief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2019-05-07HouseChief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2019-05-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. André Thapedi

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback