IL HR0357 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the Illinois Gaming Board to conduct a disparity study on whether minority and women-owned businesses face any barriers that prevent their equitable participation in the business of legalized sports wagering.
Title
SPORTS WAGERING-IGB STUDY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2020-03-17 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2020-03-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-07-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-05-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. André Thapedi |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Revenue & Finance Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-05-14 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-05-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2019-05-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-05-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-05-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-05-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-05-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2019-05-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-05-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-05-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2019-05-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-05-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-05-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-05-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-05-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2019-05-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-05-07 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-05-07 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2019-05-07 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-05-07 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2019-05-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. André Thapedi |