IL HR0359 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the General Assembly to consider developing a campaign finance reform structure and implementing it specifically in regard to elections for the Chicago Board of Education. Encourages members of the Illinois General Assembly to work with city officials and interested members of the Chicago Public Schools community to develop legislation that may be introduced after the creation of an elected Chicago Board of Education.
Title
CHICAGO PUBLIC SCHOOLS-G.A.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-17 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2020-03-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-05-14 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-05-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kambium Buckner |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=359&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0359.htm |