IL HR0371 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Encourages the Illinois State Board of Education, the Illinois Community College Board, and the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity to work collaboratively with each other and with school districts, community colleges, business and industry, and other organizations to ensure alignment among the Perkins and WIOA plans and priority occupational areas. Directs the ISBE, ICCB, and DCEO to report to the General Assembly and the P-20 Council on how the State's draft versions of the Perkins and WIOA plans address the foregoing recommendations.
Title
PERKINS PLAN-WIOA
Sponsors
Rep. Fred Crespo [D] | Rep. Kelly Burke [D] | Rep. Katie Stuart [D] | Rep. Mark Batinick [R] |
Rep. Maurice West [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-06-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2019-06-01 | House | Resolution Adopted as Amended |
2019-06-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2019-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2019-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo |
2019-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee |
2019-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-05-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2019-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo |
2019-05-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-05-24 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 015-000-000 |
2019-05-23 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-05-23 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Higher Education Committee; Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-05-23 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2019-05-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2019-05-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo |