IL HR0379 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the Department of Agriculture and the Department of Financial & Professional Regulation to conduct a disparity study on whether minority-owned businesses face any barriers that prevent the equitable participation in the business of cultivating, manufacturing, delivering, distributing, testing, transporting, and other avenues within the business of legalized cannabis in Illinois.
Title
LEGALIZED CANNABIS-AG STUDY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-23 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-05-23 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-05-23 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-05-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2019-05-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-05-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2019-05-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2019-05-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-05-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-05-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2019-05-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-05-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-05-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-05-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2019-05-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-05-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-05-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-05-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-05-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2019-05-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-05-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-05-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-05-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2019-05-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-05-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. André Thapedi |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=379&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0379.htm |