IL HR0381 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Directs the Auditor General to conduct a performance audit of the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity's Economic Development for a Growing Economy (EDGE) Tax Credit Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AUDIT-EDGE TAX CREDIT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-01HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2019-06-01HouseResolution Adopted 112-000-000
2019-05-22HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2019-05-22HouseRecommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 015-000-000
2019-05-21HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2019-05-21HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Revenue & Finance Committee; Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-05-20HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-05-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-05-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Mark L. Walker

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback