IL HR0382 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares June 10, 2019 as a day to celebrate women's right to vote and the important role Illinois played in achieving that right in the United States.
Title
WOMEN'S RIGHT TO VOTE DAY
Sponsors
Rep. Maurice West [D] | Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] | Sen. Mary Edly-Allen [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez [D] |
Rep. Dan Ugaste [R] | Rep. Mark Batinick [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2019-06-01 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2019-05-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-05-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-05-22 | House | Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 009-000-000 |
2019-05-21 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-05-21 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 State Government Administration Committee; Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-05-20 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-05-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=382&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0382.htm |