IL HR0386 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares May 2019 as "Save Your Tooth Month".
Title
SAVE YOUR TOOTH MONTH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-01 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2019-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-05-24 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 014-000-000 |
2019-05-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-05-23 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-05-23 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Health Care Licenses Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-05-23 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2019-05-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=386&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0386.htm |