IL HR0387 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Supports and endorses the Martin McGuinness Principles calling for Equality, Respect, Truth, and Self-Determination for the North of Ireland.
Title
MCGUINNESS PRINCIPLES-SUPPORT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-05-23 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
2019-05-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-05-22 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 012-000-000 |
2019-05-21 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-05-21 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-05-20 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-05-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=387&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0387.htm |